+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 127
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2014: SB 127 w/SA 1 Poore Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
June 18, 2014: SA 1 to SB 127 Poore Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 18, 2014: SB 127 w/SA 1 Poore Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor