+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House and assigned to House Administration Committee
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate