+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41