+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 123 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 123 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor