+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 123 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 123 - Stricken in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 123 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 7 NO 2 NOT VOTING
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 NOT VOTING
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor