+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 NOT VOTING
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 120 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 Unfavorable
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 120
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor