+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41