+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 6 On Its Merits
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 118
Passed