+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 118 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 118 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- SS 1 FOR SB 118 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- SS 1 FOR SB 118 - Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
- SS 1 FOR SB 118 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- SS 1 FOR SB 118 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 118 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 118 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 118
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate