+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 12 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 117 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 117 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 7 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor