+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate