+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in House
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2013: SB 114 w/SA 3 Henry Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
June 26, 2013: SA 3 to SB 114 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
June 26, 2013: SB 114 w/SA 3 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1