+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor