+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor