+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41