+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2014: SB 110 Bushweller Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
June 20, 2013: SB 110 Bushweller Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor