+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 109 - Stricken in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 109 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 109 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 109 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor