+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor