+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 104 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 104 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor