+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 103 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 103 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor