+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor