+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39