+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor