+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 3 to SB 10 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 2 ABSENT
- Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 10 - Stricken in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 10 - Stricken in Senate
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 3 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 10 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor