+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor