+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Signed by Governor
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 2 for SB 1
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 11 NO 1 ABSENT
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 2 for SB 1
- SS 2 for SB 1 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 1 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 Unfavorable
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 1
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor