+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 434, and assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor