+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
- Introduced in House and assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor