+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor