+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor