+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 14 On Its Merits
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 36
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor