+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 2 to HCR 38
Passed
HA 1 to HCR 38
Passed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor