+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 ABSENT
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 91 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 91 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 91 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 91 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor