+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 Favorable
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor