+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 89 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1
This Amendment restores the original deadline for filing certificates of nomination for minor parties to August 1st.
+ − Vote
: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor