+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 ABSENT
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18