+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 85 - - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 6 YES 8 NO 5 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
- HS 1 for HB 85 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 85 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 85 - Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 85 - - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 25 NO 1 ABSENT
- HS 1 for HB 85 - Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HS 1 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 85
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor