+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 80 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 80 - Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 80 - Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 80 - Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 80 - Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 80
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor