+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 75
Passed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor