+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 22 YES 17 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Restored in House
- Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 19 YES 18 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2014: HB 72 Mitchell Defeated Rescinded (House)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 8, 2014: HB 72 Mitchell Passed (House)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor