+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 71 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 71 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21