+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2013: HB 70 Gray Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
April 30, 2013: HB 70 Gray Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor