+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 66 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 66 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 66 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 66 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 1
This amendment changes the deadline for filing a corporate tentative return from April 1 to April 15 of the current year and corrects a typographical error.
HA 1
This amendment changes the deadline for filing a corporate tentative return from April 1 to April 15 of the current year and corrects a typographical error.
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
: House Vote
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor