+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor