+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor