+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor