+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21