+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor