+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 10 YES 8 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 defeated
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 7 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 18 YES 21 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 4 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 defeated
- Amendment HA 4 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 3 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 5 defeated
- Amendment HA 5 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 16 YES 24 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 29 YES 11 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendments (7)
SA 2 to HB 5
Defeated
SA 1 to HB 5
Stricken
HA 4 to HB 5
Passed
HA 5 to HB 5
Defeated
HA 2 to HB 5
Stricken
HA 3 to HB 5
Stricken
HA 1 to HB 5
Defeated
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor