+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor